Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR39 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2015

                    By: Fraser S.J.R. No. 39
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2015; March 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and
 Economic Development; April 1, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 3; April 1, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the legislature
 to permit professional sports team charitable foundations to
 conduct charitable raffles.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 47, Article III, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Legislature shall pass laws prohibiting lotteries
 and gift enterprises in this State other than those authorized by
 Subsections (b), (d), (d-1), and (e) of this section.
 (d-1)  The legislature by general law may permit a
 professional sports team charitable foundation to conduct
 charitable raffles under the terms and conditions imposed by
 general law.  The law may authorize the charitable foundation to pay
 with the raffle proceeds reasonable advertising, promotional, and
 administrative expenses.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment authorizing the
 legislature to permit professional sports team charitable
 foundations to conduct charitable raffles."
 * * * * *