Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR43 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/11/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R8973 JAM-D
 By: Huffines S.J.R. No. 43


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the issuance of
 certain debt and the use of certain revenue for toll roads.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49-m(a), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The legislature, by law, may authorize the Texas
 Transportation Commission or its successor to authorize the Texas
 Department of Transportation or its successor to issue notes or
 borrow money from any source to carry out the functions of the
 department other than department functions related to toll roads.
 SECTION 2.  Section 49-n(a), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, as proposed by H.J.R. 28, 78th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2003, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To fund highway improvement projects, other than toll
 roads, the legislature may authorize the Texas Transportation
 Commission or its successor to issue bonds and other public
 securities and enter into bond enhancement agreements that are
 payable from revenue deposited to the credit of the state highway
 fund.
 SECTION 3.  Section 49-p(a), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To provide funding for highway improvement projects,
 other than toll roads, the legislature by general law may authorize
 the Texas Transportation Commission or its successor to issue
 general obligation bonds of the State of Texas in an aggregate
 amount not to exceed $5 billion and enter into related credit
 agreements. The bonds shall be executed in the form, on the terms,
 and in the denominations, bear interest, and be issued in
 installments as prescribed by the Texas Transportation Commission
 or its successor.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, Texas
 Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-a.  Subject to legislative appropriation, allocation
 and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment of all
 refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived from
 motor vehicle registration fees, and all taxes, except gross
 production and ad valorem taxes, on motor fuels and lubricants used
 to propel motor vehicles over public roadways, shall be used for the
 sole purpose of policing public roadways and for acquiring
 rights-of-way for and [,] constructing and [,] maintaining[, and
 policing such] public roadways, other than toll roads, and for the
 administration of such laws as may be prescribed by the Legislature
 pertaining to the supervision of traffic and safety on such roads;
 [and for the payment of the principal and interest on county and
 road district bonds or warrants voted or issued prior to January 2,
 1939, and declared eligible prior to January 2, 1945, for payment
 out of the County and Road District Highway Fund under existing
 law;] provided, however, that one-fourth (1/4) of such net revenue
 from the motor fuel tax shall be allocated to the Available School
 Fund; and, provided, however, that the net revenue derived by
 counties from motor vehicle registration fees shall never be less
 than the maximum amounts allowed to be retained by each County and
 the percentage allowed to be retained by each County under the laws
 in effect on January 1, 1945. Nothing contained herein shall be
 construed as authorizing the pledging of the State's credit for any
 purpose.
 Sec. 7-b.  All revenues received from the federal government
 as reimbursement for state expenditures of funds that are
 themselves dedicated for policing public roadways and for acquiring
 rights-of-way for and constructing and[,] maintaining[, and
 policing] public roadways, other than toll roads, are also
 constitutionally dedicated and shall be used only for those
 purposes.
 SECTION 5.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, prescribing the purposes for which debt may
 be issued and for which revenue from motor vehicle registration
 fees, taxes on motor fuels and lubricants, and certain revenues
 received from the federal government may be used.
 (b)  The amendments to Sections 49-m, 49-n, and 49-p, Article
 III, and Sections 7-a and 7-b, Article VIII, of this constitution
 apply only in connection with a state fiscal biennium that begins on
 or after September 1, 2017.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires September 2, 2017.
 SECTION 6.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 issuance of certain debt and the use of certain revenue for toll
 roads."