Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR5 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/04/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R3130 CJC-D
 By: Nichols, Nelson S.J.R. No. 5


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
 derived from the tax imposed on the sale of motor vehicles to the
 state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a)  Subject to Subsection (b) of this section,
 all net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter 152, Tax
 Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle
 sold in this state that exceeds the first $2.5 billion of that
 revenue coming into the treasury for a state fiscal year shall be
 deposited to the credit of the state highway fund and may be
 appropriated only to:
 (1)  construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
 public roadways other than toll roads; or
 (2)  repay the principal and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (b)  Revenue described by Subsection (a) of this section
 that, under general law in effect on January 1, 2015, was required
 to be deposited to the credit of a fund outside the general revenue
 fund from which money could be appropriated only for a purpose that
 decreases the rates of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes
 imposed to fund public schools is not included as part of the first
 $2.5 billion coming into the treasury for purposes of Subsection
 (a) of this section, and is not subject to the requirements
 applicable to the deposit of money in excess of $2.5 billion
 prescribed by Subsection (a) of this section, to the extent general
 law continues to require the deposit of that revenue as described by
 this subsection and limit the appropriation of that revenue to the
 purpose described by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, dedicating certain revenue derived from the
 tax imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle sold in this state to the
 state highway fund.
 (b)  The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by
 the amendment take effect September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on
 September 1, 2017, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue
 to which Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution applies
 for any purpose other than a purpose described by Section 7-c(a),
 Article VIII, of this constitution.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale of a motor vehicle
 sold in this state to the state highway fund."