Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR5 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/02/2015

                    By: Nichols, et al. S.J.R. No. 5
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 2, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 2, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 5 By:  Nichols


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
 derived from the tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor
 vehicle to the state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a)  Subject to Subsection (c) of this section,
 the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by Chapter 152, Tax
 Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a
 motor vehicle that exceeds the first $2.5 billion of that revenue
 coming into the treasury in a state fiscal year shall be deposited
 as follows:
 (1)  the next $2.5 billion of that revenue coming into
 the treasury in that state fiscal year shall be deposited to the
 credit of the state highway fund; and
 (2)  any additional revenue to which this subsection
 applies that comes into the treasury in that state fiscal year shall
 be deposited:
 (A)  one-half to the credit of the state highway
 fund; and
 (B)  the remainder to the credit of the general
 revenue fund.
 (b)  Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
 under this section may be appropriated only to:
 (1)  construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
 public roadways other than toll roads; or
 (2)  repay the principal of and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (c)  Revenue described by Subsection (a) of this section
 that, under general law in effect on January 1, 2015, was required
 to be deposited to the credit of a fund outside the general revenue
 fund from which money could be appropriated only for a purpose that
 decreases the rates of, or reduces reliance on, ad valorem taxes
 imposed to fund public schools is not included as part of the first
 $5 billion coming into the treasury for purposes of Subsection (a)
 of this section, and the requirements applicable to the deposit of
 money in excess of $2.5 billion prescribed by Subsection (a) of this
 section do not apply to that revenue to the extent general law
 continues to require the deposit of that revenue as described by
 this subsection and limit the appropriation of that revenue to the
 purpose described by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, dedicating certain revenue derived from the
 tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the
 state highway fund.
 (b)  The changes to Article VIII of this constitution made by
 the amendment take effect September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Beginning with the state fiscal year beginning on
 September 1, 2017, the legislature may not appropriate any revenue
 to which Section 7-c(a)(1) or (2)(A), Article VIII, of this
 constitution applies for any purpose other than a purpose described
 by Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution.
 (d)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 8, 2016.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 revenue derived from the tax imposed on the sale, use, or rental of
 a motor vehicle to the state highway fund."
 * * * * *