Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR5 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.J.R. No. 5


 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating a portion of the
 revenue derived from the state sales and use tax and the tax imposed
 on the sale, use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the state highway
 fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  (a)  Subject to Subsections (d) and (e) of this
 section, in each state fiscal year, the comptroller of public
 accounts shall deposit to the credit of the state highway fund $2.5
 billion of the net revenue derived from the imposition of the state
 sales and use tax on the sale, storage, use, or other consumption in
 this state of taxable items under Chapter 151, Tax Code, or its
 successor, that exceeds the first $28 billion of that revenue
 coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (d) and (e) of this section, in
 each state fiscal year, the comptroller of public accounts shall
 deposit to the credit of the state highway fund an amount equal to
 35 percent of the net revenue derived from the tax authorized by
 Chapter 152, Tax Code, or its successor, and imposed on the sale,
 use, or rental of a motor vehicle that exceeds the first $5 billion
 of that revenue coming into the treasury in that state fiscal year.
 (c)  Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
 under this section may be appropriated only to:
 (1)  construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
 public roadways other than toll roads; or
 (2)  repay the principal of and interest on general
 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
 of this constitution.
 (d)  The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house of the
 legislature may direct the comptroller of public accounts to reduce
 the amount of money deposited to the credit of the state highway
 fund under Subsection (a) or (b) of this section.  The comptroller
 may be directed to make that reduction only:
 (1)  in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is
 adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  by an amount or percentage that does not result in
 a reduction of more than 50 percent of the amount that would
 otherwise be deposited to the fund in the affected state fiscal year
 under the applicable subsection of this section.
 (e)  Subject to Subsection (f) of this section, the duty of
 the comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under this
 section expires:
 (1)  August 31, 2032, for a deposit required by
 Subsection (a) of this section; and
 (2)  August 31, 2029, for a deposit required by
 Subsection (b) of this section.
 (f)  The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of a majority of the members of each house of the
 legislature may extend, in 10-year increments, the duty of the
 comptroller of public accounts to make a deposit under Subsection
 (a) or (b) of this section beyond the applicable date prescribed by
 Subsection (e) of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, dedicating a portion of the revenue derived
 from the state sales and use tax and the tax imposed on the sale,
 use, or rental of a motor vehicle to the state highway fund.
 (b)  Section 7-c(a), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2017.
 (c)  Section 7-c(b), Article VIII, of this constitution
 takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (d)  Beginning on the dates prescribed by Subsections (b) and
 (c) of this section, the legislature may not appropriate any
 revenue to which Section 7-c(a) or (b), Article VIII, of this
 constitution applies that is deposited to the credit of the state
 highway fund for any purpose other than a purpose described by
 Section 7-c(c), Article VIII, of this constitution.
 (e)  This temporary provision expires September 1, 2020.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 sales and use tax revenue and motor vehicle sales, use, and rental
 tax revenue to the state highway fund to provide funding for
 nontolled roads and the reduction of certain
 transportation-related debt."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 5 passed the Senate on
 March 4, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2;
 May 4, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 6, 2015, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2015, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 5 passed the House, with
 amendments, on April 30, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 138,
 Nays 3, one present not voting; May 6, 2015, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 30, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House