Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR62 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Nichols S.J.R. No. 62
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 62 By:  Nichols


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment dedicating certain revenue
 sources to be used for the acquisition of rights-of-way for and the
 construction and maintenance of public roadways.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-c to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-c.  Subject to legislative appropriation,
 allocation, and direction, all net revenues remaining after payment
 of all refunds allowed by law and expenses of collection derived
 from the following sources shall be used only for the acquisition of
 rights-of-way for and the construction and maintenance of public
 roadways other than toll roads:
 (1)  fees for permits that authorize a motor vehicle or
 combination of motor vehicles that exceed the weight or size limits
 allowed by this state to operate on a highway in this state;
 (2)  payments received under a comprehensive
 development agreement for a toll project or system of the Texas
 Department of Transportation or its successor;
 (3)  the sale or transfer of any interest in a highway
 right-of-way or real property acquired for a state highway purpose
 that is no longer needed for a state highway purpose; and
 (4)  the sale of surplus motor vehicles by state
 agencies.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 3, 2015.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment dedicating certain
 revenue sources to be used for the acquisition of rights-of-way for
 and the construction and maintenance of public roadways."
 * * * * *