Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR278 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/02/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 278
 In Memory
 of
 Gerald Lee Kunkle
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Collin County lost an admired
 public servant with the passing of Constable Gerald Lee Kunkle on
 February 13, 2015, at the age of 76; and
 WHEREAS, Born on February 14, 1938, in Shreveport, Louisiana,
 Jerry Kunkle was the son of Benjamin and Helen Kunkle; he served for
 three years with the military police in the United States Marine
 Corps, where he was stationed in Honolulu and excelled at playing
 football for the corps; after he was discharged in 1959, he returned
 home and attended the University of North Texas on a football
 scholarship; he married the former Hannah Dungan on October 3, 1961,
 and the couple raised four children; and
 WHEREAS, Constable Kunkle began working for Collin County
 as a deputy sheriff in 1962 and was soon promoted to chief deputy;
 he worked briefly as a radio station manager before returning to
 work for the county as an adult probation officer in 1971,
 eventually reassuming the role of chief deputy; in 1979, he was
 appointed to the office of Precinct 1 constable, and he continued
 to be reelected to that position until his retirement in 2008;
 over the course of a tenure that spanned nearly three decades, a
 number of new programs were launched, including the
 establishment of the warrant division; he was named Texas
 Constable of the Year in 1997; and
 WHEREAS, Further contributing to his professional
 community, Constable Kunkle served as president of the Justices
 of the Peace and Constables Association of Texas, and he received
 the association's highest honor, the T. A. Vines Award, in 2003; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted family man and a dedicated public
 servant, Jerry Kunkle will be deeply missed, but the integrity
 and optimism with which he lived his life will forever inspire
 all who had the good fortune to know him; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Constable Gerald
 Lee Kunkle and extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of his
 family: to his wife, Hannah Kunkle; to his children, Mark,
 Kimberly, and Matt Kunkle and Keri Hardin; to his grandchildren,
 Mason, Morgan, Miles, and Mendel Kunkle and Hayden Hardin; to his
 great-grandson, Hagen Kunkle; to his stepfather, Edward
 R. McGehee; and to his other relatives and friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Jerry Kunkle.
 Taylor of Collin
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 2, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate