Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR449 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 449
 WHEREAS, Proud citizens of Rusk County are assembling at
 the Texas State Capitol to celebrate Rusk County Days on March 31
 and April 1, 2015; and
 WHEREAS, A picturesque region of rolling hills in the Piney
 Woods of East Texas, Rusk County was first occupied by the Caddo
 and the Cherokee tribes; the first European settlers arrived in
 the 1830s, and on January 16, 1843, the county was formed by act
 of the Congress of the Republic of Texas and named after Thomas
 Jefferson Rusk, secretary of war under Texas President Sam
 Houston; and
 WHEREAS, For many years, the county's economy was based on
 cotton and other agriculture, but on October 3, 1930, Columbus
 Marion "Dad" Joiner struck oil at his famous Daisy Bradford
 Number 3 well, opening up the East Texas oil field, which at the
 time was the largest oil field in the world; three years later,
 Rusk County was producing over 200 million barrels of petroleum a
 year, turning county seat Henderson from a sleepy village to a
 bustling boomtown; and
 WHEREAS, Oil and agriculture continue to be mainstays of
 the county's economy, along with natural gas, timber, and the
 mining of lignite coal; in addition, Rusk County's bricks, made
 from the region's unique clay soil, are highly prized; the county
 economy is further bolstered by two correctional institutions,
 including the Bradshaw State Jail in Henderson; and
 WHEREAS, Only two miles from "Dad" Joiner's original well,
 the Gaston Museum in Joinerville commemorates the history of the
 East Texas oil field; in Henderson, the Depot Museum, a
 beautifully restored Missouri Pacific railway depot from 1901,
 hosts the annual Heritage Syrup Festival every November;
 recreational opportunities abound in the county's parks,
 including Martin Creek Lake State Park, which offers swimming,
 boating, fishing, waterskiing, and other activities; and
 WHEREAS, Honoring their heritage as they embrace the
 opportunities of the future, the citizens of Rusk County may take
 great pride in the role their communities have played in the
 story of the Lone Star State; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby recognize March 31 and April 1, 2015, as Rusk
 County Days at the State Capitol and extend to the visiting
 delegation sincere best wishes for an informative and enjoyable
 stay in Austin.
 Eltife
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 30, 2015.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate