Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR802 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/14/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 802
 In Memory
 of
 Anthony R. Maddox
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas joins the citizens
 of Port Arthur in mourning the loss of Sergeant Anthony R. Maddox,
 who died July 22, 2013, at the age of 23; and
 WHEREAS, Anthony Maddox was born on November 15, 1990, to
 Glenda Key and Jerome Maddox Jr.; he graduated from Nederland
 High School in 2009; and
 WHEREAS, After graduation, he entered the Job Corps, and in
 2011, he joined the United States Army; as a soldier, Sergeant
 Maddox exemplified steadfast resolve and courage, yet his life
 was tragically cut short after he sustained injuries while
 stationed in Afghanistan; and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Maddox served his country with
 distinction; he was an American hero whose dedicated service to
 the nation will not be forgotten; he was beloved by his many
 family members and by his friends, and his spirit continues to
 live on in the hearts of those he left behind; and
 WHEREAS, In recognition of his ultimate sacrifice in the
 Global War on Terror, Sergeant Maddox is being posthumously
 honored at a Joint Memorial Day Ceremony in the Texas House of
 Representatives on May 23, 2015; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 84th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Sergeant Anthony R. Maddox; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Anthony R. Maddox.
 Creighton
 Bettencourt Hancock Rodríguez Bettencourt Hancock Rodríguez
Bettencourt Hancock Rodríguez
 Birdwell Hinojosa Schwertner Birdwell Hinojosa Schwertner
Birdwell Hinojosa Schwertner
 Burton Huffines Seliger Burton Huffines Seliger
Burton Huffines Seliger
 Campbell Huffman Taylor of Galveston Campbell Huffman Taylor of Galveston
Campbell Huffman Taylor of Galveston
 Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin
Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin
 Eltife Lucio Uresti Eltife Lucio Uresti
Eltife Lucio Uresti
 Estes Menéndez Watson Estes Menéndez Watson
Estes Menéndez Watson
 Fraser Nelson West Fraser Nelson West
Fraser Nelson West
 Garcia Nichols Whitmire Garcia Nichols Whitmire
Garcia Nichols Whitmire
 Hall Perry Zaffirini Hall Perry Zaffirini
Hall Perry Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 13, 2015, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Bettencourt Hancock Rodríguez

Birdwell Hinojosa Schwertner

Burton Huffines Seliger

Campbell Huffman Taylor of Galveston

Ellis Kolkhorst Taylor of Collin

Eltife Lucio Uresti

Estes Menéndez Watson

Fraser Nelson West

Garcia Nichols Whitmire

Hall Perry Zaffirini