Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1279

Recognizing March 18, 2015, as Best Southwest Partnership Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR128

Commemorating the investiture of Jane Cummins as the 2015 president of the Texas Lyceum.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1280

Recognizing March 24, 2015, as Tarleton State University Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1281

Congratulating Mariachi Cascabel of Rio Grande City High School for winning Class 5A of the 2015 Texas High School Mariachi Competition.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1282

Congratulating Hurley Funeral Home on its receipt of a 2015 Texas Treasure Business Award.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1283

Congratulating Mariachi Cotuleno of Cotulla High School for winning Class 3A of the 2015 Texas High School Mariachi Competition.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1284

Congratulating Mariachi Grulla de Plata of Grulla High School for winning Class 4A of the 2015 Texas High School Mariachi Competition.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1285

Honoring former Duval County justice of the peace Jose B. Canales.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1286

In memory of Barbara V. Canales of Freer.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1287

In memory of Helen Kilroy of Santa Fe, Texas.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1288

Commemorating the 45th anniversary of Earth Day on April 22, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1289

Commemorating Earth Day on April 22, 2016.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR129

Recognizing February 12, 2015, as San Patricio County Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1290

Recognizing the Texas A&M University Agricultural and Natural Resources Policy Internship Program and the Public Policy Internship Program and the interns for the 84th legislative session.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1291

Congratulating Stephanie Simpson on her selection as a 2015 Woman of the Year candidate by the South Central Texas Chapter of the Leukemia and Lymphoma Society.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records