Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House of Representatives 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1947

Commemorating the 160th anniversary of Beech Creek Baptist Church.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1948

Congratulating Calvin Burks and Hank Bostock of the Corrigan-Camden High School fishing team on their performance at the SETX High School Fishing Association tournament on March 28, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1949

Congratulating John E. Bierschwale on his retirement as deputy city manager of Schertz.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR195

Recognizing February 28, 2015, as Rare Disease Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1950

Recognizing Shriners Hospital for Children at Galveston for its work in the community and its commitment to burn research.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1951

Commemorating the 50th wedding anniversary of Don and Mary Anne Seale of Parker.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1952

In memory of Jerre Wayne Bardin.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1953

Congratulating the members of the San Antonio Young Women's Leadership Academy Class of 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1954

Commending James P. Graham of Dallas for his civic leadership and volunteer work.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1955

Honoring the Fraternal Alliance of Texas on the occasion of Join Hands Day, May 2, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1956

Congratulating the Texas Tech University baseball team on its successful 2014 season.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1957

Recognizing April 28, 2015, as Workers' Memorial Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1958

Honoring the Reverend Christopher L. Taylor for his service as Pastor of the Day on April 22, 2015.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR1959

Congratulating Starla Wade on being named Student of the Week at Jasper Junior High School.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HR196

Recognizing February 18, 2015, as United Way Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records