Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR234

Recognizing the Pflugerville Chamber of Commerce on the occasion of its 30th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR235

Recognizing Vietnamese Americans for their contributions to this state.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR236

In memory of Cleophas R. Steele Jr.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR237

Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Van Zandt County Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR238

Recognizing the state champions from the Ann Richards School for Young Women Leaders Youth and Government program.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR239

Celebrating February 23 and 24, 2015, as Rockwall County Days.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR24

Recognizing Pioneers Youth Leadership, Incorporated, on the occasion of its Pioneers State Leadership Forum.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR240

Recognizing Colin Kimball for his receipt of the Silver Patrick Henry Medallion.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR241

Recognizing March 2, 2015, as Fast Growth School Coalition Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR242

Celebrating March 3, 2015, as Port Isabel Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR243

Recognizing February 26, 2015, as Aransas County Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR244

Recognizing March 3, 2015, as Wharton County Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR245

Recognizing February 25 and 26, 2015, as Palestine Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR246

Recognizing the Texas Forestry Association on the occasion of its seedling giveaway.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR247

Proclaiming March 4, 2015, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records