Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR424

Recognizing March 25, 2015, as Ward and Winkler Counties Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR425

Recognizing Jeff Pilchiek for his contributions to the field of education.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR426

Commending BBVA Compass and the Mexican and Spanish students at The University of Texas at Austin.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR427

Recognizing March 24, 2015, as CHRISTUS Santa Rosa Health System Advocacy Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR428

Proclaiming April 16, 2015, as Texas Federation of Republican Women Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR429

Recognizing March 24, 2015, as Montgomery County Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR43

Recognizing Sidney Richardson on the occasion of his 90th birthday.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR430

Celebrating March 30, 2015, as Baylor Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR431

Recognizing Billy Parker on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR432

Recognizing the centennial of the Texas A&M Engineering Experiment Station.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR433

In memory of James Edwin Russell Jr.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR434

In memory of Johnnie B. Rogers.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR435

In memory of Mike Higgins.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR436

Recognizing March 31, 2015, as San Antonio Music Teachers Association Centennial Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR437

Recognizing the naming of Jaime P. Martinez Place in San Antonio.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records