Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate 2015 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR438

Commending Chase Romanski for achieving the rank of Eagle Scout.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR439

Recognizing the dedication of the Texas Capitol Vietnam Veterans Monument.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR44

Recognizing The University of Texas Rio Grande Valley School of Medicine for receiving a grant from the United Health Foundation.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR440

Congratulating the Palmview High School Mariachi Los Lobos band for winning a state mariachi competition.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR441

Recognizing Don Nelson on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR442

Recognizing September 28 through October 2, 2015, as Malnutrition Awareness Week in Texas.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR443

Recognizing April 8, 2015, as Masonic Grand Lodge of Texas Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR444

Commending BikeTexas for its dedication to improving bicycle safety.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR445

Congratulating Carol Lewis on her induction into the Southwest Conference Hall of Fame.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR446

Recognizing Dale Luke Smiley on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR447

Recognizing April 7, 2015, as Red and White Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR448

Recognizing April 2, 2015, as Homelessness Awareness Day.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR449

Recognizing March 31 and April 1, 2015, as Rusk County Days.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR45

In memory of Scott Crane.
TX

Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR450

Recognizing the Texas State Soil and Water Conservation Board on the occasion of its 75th anniversary.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records