Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1020 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2017

                    By: Smithee, Farrar (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1020
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 3, 2017;
 April 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 1, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 1, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to volunteer practice by an inactive member of the State
 Bar of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 81.053(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An inactive member may not practice law in this state,
 except as provided by rule promulgated by the supreme court for
 volunteer practice, and may not hold an office in the state bar[,]
 or vote in any election conducted by the state bar.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *