Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1066 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 1066
 (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the collection of certain judgments through court
 proceeding.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.002(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A judgment creditor is entitled to aid from a court of
 appropriate jurisdiction through injunction or other means in order
 to reach property to obtain satisfaction on the judgment if the
 judgment debtor owns property, including present or future rights
 to property, that[:
 [(1)     cannot readily be attached or levied on by
 ordinary legal process; and
 [(2)]  is not exempt from attachment, execution, or
 seizure for the satisfaction of liabilities.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies to the
 collection of any judgment, regardless of whether the judgment was
 entered before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *