Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1148 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/19/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    85R3272 JG-D
 By: Davis of Harris H.B. No. 1148


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to emergency medical services and trauma care systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 773.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.026.  EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES COORDINATION
 PLAN. (a) The administrative hubs designated under Section
 773.125, in consultation with each trauma service area regional
 advisory council and the advisory council established by Section
 773.012, shall collectively develop a written 25-year plan for
 coordinating emergency medical services throughout this state.
 (b)  The emergency medical services coordination plan must
 include strategies to provide services for:
 (1)  stroke;
 (2)  ST-elevation myocardial infarction;
 (3)  neonatal care;
 (4)  maternal care;
 (5)  mental health care; and
 (6)  any other area of care provided under the
 authority of a trauma service area regional advisory council.
 (c)  The administrative hubs shall develop and submit the
 emergency medical services coordination plan to the department not
 later than September 1, 2021.  This subsection expires September 1,
 2022.
 SECTION 2.  Section 773.112, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The executive commissioner, in consultation with the
 department, shall conduct a comprehensive review of the rules
 adopted under this section every seven years.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 773.125, 773.126, 773.127, and
 773.128 to read as follows:
 Sec. 773.125.  ADMINISTRATIVE HUBS: DESIGNATION. (a) The
 department shall designate eight administrative hubs to provide
 administrative functions for each trauma service area regional
 advisory council located in the public health region served by the
 hub.
 (b)  A health care entity, including a trauma service area
 regional advisory council, in a public health region may apply to
 the department in accordance with department rules to be designated
 as an administrative hub for the trauma service area regional
 advisory councils in the public health region.
 (c)  An applicant must demonstrate the applicant has the
 personnel, knowledge, skills, and resources necessary to provide
 the administrative functions for each trauma service area regional
 advisory council in the applicant's public health region.
 (c-1)  An applicant must submit an initial application under
 Subsection (b) not later than September 1, 2018.  The department
 shall designate a qualified applicant to serve as the
 administrative hub not later than September 1, 2019.  An applicant
 designated to serve as an administrative hub under this subsection
 shall carry out the duties imposed by Section 773.126 as soon as
 practicable after the selection and not later than September 1,
 2020.  This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
 (d)  If a health care entity eligible to serve as an
 administrative hub under this section has not applied for the
 designation in a public health region, the department shall
 designate the health care entity with the most appropriate
 qualifications in the public health region to serve as the
 administrative hub for that region.
 Sec. 773.126.  ADMINISTRATIVE HUBS: DUTIES. (a) Except as
 provided by Section 773.128, an administrative hub shall perform
 all administrative functions, including contract management, grant
 application management, and payroll, for each trauma service area
 regional advisory council under the hub's jurisdiction.
 (b)  The department shall directly contract with an
 administrative hub for administrative duties provided by the hub as
 required by this section.
 (c)  An administrative hub shall administer and distribute
 funds to each trauma service area regional advisory council under
 the hub's jurisdiction in accordance with department rules. In
 adopting rules under this subsection, the executive commissioner
 shall require that an administrative hub distribute funds according
 to a trauma service area regional advisory council's population,
 annual number of trauma care runs, geographic size, and annual
 number of deaths.
 (d)  An administrative hub shall enter into a centralized
 purchasing agreement with the trauma service area regional advisory
 councils under the hub's jurisdiction to consolidate purchases for
 the trauma service area regional advisory councils as appropriate.
 (e)  An administrative hub shall submit to the department in
 the manner required by the department an annual report on the amount
 of money spent by the administrative hub in providing consolidated
 administrative services for the trauma service area regional
 advisory councils under the hub's jurisdiction compared to the
 amount of money that would have been spent if each trauma service
 area regional advisory council had provided its own administrative
 services.
 Sec. 773.127.  ADMINISTRATIVE HUBS: TRANSFER OF TRAUMA
 SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCILS. (a) A trauma service area
 regional advisory council may apply to the department in accordance
 with department rules for a transfer from the jurisdiction of the
 trauma service area regional advisory council's administrative hub
 to the jurisdiction of an administrative hub in an adjacent public
 health region.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall develop criteria for
 determining whether an administrative hub has the personnel,
 knowledge, skills, and resources necessary to provide
 administrative support for a trauma service area regional advisory
 council applying for a transfer to that administrative hub's
 jurisdiction under this subsection.
 Sec. 773.128.  ADMINISTRATIVE HUBS: REQUEST BY TRAUMA
 SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCIL TO RETAIN CERTAIN
 ADMINISTRATIVE FUNCTIONS. (a) A trauma service area regional
 advisory council may file a written request with the department to
 retain an administrative function that has been delegated to an
 administrative hub. The request must include evidence that the
 trauma service area regional advisory council has the personnel,
 knowledge, skills, and resources necessary to perform the
 administrative function in a more cost-effective manner than the
 function is being performed by the administrative hub.
 (b)  The department shall grant the request and notify the
 administrative hub of the department's decision if the request
 includes sufficient evidence for the department to determine
 whether the trauma service area regional advisory council has the
 personnel, knowledge, skills, and resources required by this
 section.
 SECTION 4.  The executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall adopt all rules necessary to
 implement the change in law made by this Act not later than January
 1, 2018.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a contract executed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 contract executed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law applicable to the contract immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.