Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1162 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1162
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1162 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 649
 as the State Trooper David Lee Nevarez Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  STATE TROOPER DAVID LEE NEVAREZ MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a)  The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 649 between
 Farm-to-Market Road 2687 and State Highway 16 is designated as the
 State Trooper David Lee Nevarez Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the State Trooper David Lee Nevarez Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *