Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1221 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Stephenson (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 1221
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 90
 Alternate as the Johnnie David Hutchins Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.   JOHNNIE DAVID HUTCHINS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) The portion of U.S. Highway 90 Alternate in Wharton County is
 designated as the Johnnie David Hutchins Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Johnnie David Hutchins Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *