Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1234 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1234


 AN ACT
 relating to filing fees imposed in civil cases in Hidalgo County and
 Cameron County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.711, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b), (f), (g), (h), and (i) and adding
 Subsection (e-1) to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this section and in
 addition to all other fees authorized or required by other law, the
 clerk of a court shall collect a filing fee of not more than $20 in
 each civil case filed in the court to be used:
 (1)  for the construction, renovation, or improvement
 of the facilities that house the Hidalgo County or Cameron County
 civil courts; and
 (2)  to pay the principal of, interest on, and costs of
 issuance of bonds, including refunding bonds, issued for the
 construction, renovation, or improvement of the facilities that
 house the Hidalgo County or Cameron County civil courts.
 (e-1)  If Hidalgo County or Cameron County has adopted a
 resolution authorizing a fee as provided by Subsection (e) that is
 abolished on or before October 1, 2030, the county may:
 (1)  adopt a resolution authorizing the fee adopted
 under Subsection (e) to continue until October 1, 2045;
 (2)  adopt a resolution providing that the county must
 continue to spend one dollar for the construction, renovation, or
 improvement of the court facilities for each dollar spent from the
 special account dedicated to that purpose; and
 (3)  file the resolution adopted under this subsection
 with the county treasurer or with any other official who discharges
 the duties commonly assigned to the county treasurer not later than
 September 1 immediately preceding the first 12-month period during
 which the county has authorized the fee to continue to be collected
 through October 1, 2045.
 (f)  A resolution adopted under Subsection (e) continues
 from year to year until October 1, 2030, if adopted under Subsection
 (e) before September 1, 2017, or October 1, 2045, if adopted under
 Subsection (e) on or after September 1, 2017, allowing the county to
 collect fees under the terms of this section until the resolution is
 rescinded.  A resolution adopted under Subsection (e-1) continues
 from year to year until October 1, 2045, allowing the county to
 collect fees under the terms of this section until the resolution is
 rescinded.
 (g)  The commissioners court of the county collecting the fee
 may rescind a resolution adopted under Subsection (e) or (e-1) by
 adopting a resolution rescinding the resolution and submitting the
 rescission resolution to the county treasurer or to any other
 official who discharges the duties commonly assigned to the county
 treasurer not later than September 1 preceding the beginning of the
 first day of the county fiscal year.  The commissioners court may
 adopt an additional resolution in the manner provided by Subsection
 (e) after rescinding a previous resolution [under that subsection].
 (h)  A fee established under a particular resolution is
 abolished on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date a resolution adopted under Subsection (e)
 or (e-1) is rescinded as provided by Subsection (g); [or]
 (2)  October 1, 2030, if adopted under Subsection (e)
 before September 1, 2017;
 (3)  October 1, 2045, if adopted under Subsection (e)
 on or after September 1, 2017; or
 (4)  October 1, 2045, if adopted under Subsection
 (e-1).
 (i)  Hidalgo County or Cameron County may make the required
 expenditure described by Subsection (e)(2) or (e-1)(2) at any time,
 regardless of when the expenditure from the special account occurs.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 101, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 101.061194 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.061194.  ADDITIONAL DISTRICT COURT FEES FOR COURT
 FACILITIES: GOVERNMENT CODE.  The clerk of a district court in
 Hidalgo County and the clerk of a district court in Cameron County
 shall collect an additional filing fee of not more than $20 under
 Section 51.711, Government Code, in civil cases to fund the payment
 of the principal of, interest on, and costs of issuance of bonds,
 including refunding bonds, issued for the construction,
 renovation, or improvement of court facilities, if authorized by
 the county commissioners court.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter E, Chapter 101, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 101.081193 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.081193.  ADDITIONAL STATUTORY COUNTY COURT FEES FOR
 COURT FACILITIES: GOVERNMENT CODE.  The clerk of a statutory county
 court in Hidalgo County and the clerk of a statutory county court in
 Cameron County shall collect an additional filing fee of not more
 than $20 under Section 51.711, Government Code, in civil cases to
 fund the payment of the principal of, interest on, and costs of
 issuance of bonds, including refunding bonds, issued for the
 construction, renovation, or improvement of court facilities, if
 authorized by the county commissioners court.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter F, Chapter 101, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 101.101192 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.101192.  ADDITIONAL STATUTORY PROBATE COURT FEES
 FOR COURT FACILITIES: GOVERNMENT CODE.  The clerk of a statutory
 probate court in Hidalgo County shall collect an additional filing
 fee of not more than $20 under Section 51.711, Government Code, in
 civil cases to fund the payment of the principal of, interest on,
 and costs of issuance of bonds, including refunding bonds, issued
 for the construction, renovation, or improvement of court
 facilities, if authorized by the county commissioners court.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1234 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1234 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 5,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1234 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays
 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor