Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB13 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 13
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 24, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 13 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a matching grant program to support
 community mental health programs for individuals experiencing
 mental illness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0999 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0999.  GRANT PROGRAM FOR MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES.
 (a) To the extent money is appropriated to the commission for that
 purpose, the commission shall establish a matching grant program
 for the purpose of supporting community mental health programs
 providing services and treatment to individuals experiencing
 mental illness.
 (b)  The commission shall ensure that each grant recipient
 obtains or secures contributions to match awarded grants in amounts
 of money or other consideration as required by Subsection (h). The
 money or other consideration obtained or secured by the recipient,
 as determined by the executive commissioner, may include cash or
 in-kind contributions from any person but may not include money
 from state or federal funds.
 (c)  Money appropriated to or obtained by the commission for
 the matching grant program must be disbursed directly to grant
 recipients by the commission, as authorized by the executive
 commissioner.
 (d)  A grant awarded under the matching grant program and
 matching amounts must be used for the sole purpose of supporting
 community programs that provide mental health care services and
 treatment to individuals with a mental illness and that coordinate
 mental health care services for individuals with a mental illness
 with other transition support services.
 (e)  The commission shall select grant recipients based on
 the submission of applications or proposals by nonprofit and
 governmental entities. The executive commissioner shall develop
 criteria for the evaluation of those applications or proposals and
 the selection of grant recipients. The selection criteria must:
 (1)  evaluate and score:
 (A)  fiscal controls for the project;
 (B)  project effectiveness;
 (C)  project cost; and
 (D)  an applicant's previous experience with
 grants and contracts;
 (2)  address whether the services proposed in the
 application or proposal would duplicate services already available
 in the applicant's service area;
 (3)  address the possibility of and method for making
 multiple awards; and
 (4)  include other factors that the executive
 commissioner considers relevant.
 (f)  A nonprofit or governmental entity that applies for a
 grant under this section must notify each local mental health
 authority with a local service area that is covered wholly or partly
 by the entity's proposed community mental health program and must
 provide in the entity's application a letter of support from each
 local mental health authority with a local service area that is
 covered wholly or partly by the entity's proposed community mental
 health program. The commission shall consider a local mental
 health authority's written input before awarding a grant under this
 section and may take any recommendations made by the authority.
 (g)  The commission shall condition each grant awarded to a
 recipient under the program on the recipient obtaining or securing
 matching funds from non-state sources in amounts of money or other
 consideration as required by Subsection (h).
 (h)  A community that receives a grant under this section is
 required to leverage funds in an amount:
 (1)  equal to 50 percent of the grant amount if the
 community mental health program is located in a county with a
 population of less than 250,000;
 (2)  equal to 100 percent of the grant amount if the
 community mental health program is located in a county with a
 population of at least 250,000; and
 (3)  equal to the percentage of the grant amount
 otherwise required by this subsection for the largest county in
 which a community mental health program is located if the community
 mental health program is located in more than one county.
 (i)  Except as provided by Subsection (j), from money
 appropriated to the commission for each fiscal year to implement
 this section, the commission shall reserve 40 percent of that total
 to be awarded only as grants to a community mental health program
 located in a county with a population not greater than 250,000.
 (j)  To the extent money appropriated to the commission to
 implement this section for a fiscal year remains available to the
 commission after the commission selects grant recipients for the
 fiscal year, the commission shall make grants available using the
 money remaining for the fiscal year through a competitive request
 for proposal process, without regard to the limitation provided by
 Subsection (i).
 (k)  Not later than December 1 of each calendar year, the
 executive commissioner shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and each member of the legislature a report evaluating
 the success of the matching grant program created by this section.
 (l)  The executive commissioner shall adopt any rules
 necessary to implement the matching grant program under this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect only if a specific
 appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
 general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *