Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1317 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: King of Hemphill (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1317
 (In the Senate - Received from the House March 30, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays  0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of U.S. Highway 287 in Claude as the
 Charles H. Roan Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.123 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.123.  CHARLES H. ROAN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)  The
 portion of U.S. Highway 287 in Claude is designated as the Charles
 H. Roan Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Charles H. Roan Memorial Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *