Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1372 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Koop, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1372
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017;
 May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information included in the curriculum of each driver
 education course and driving safety course.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 1001.109 and 1001.1091 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1001.109.  INFORMATION RELATING TO TRAFFIC STOPS. (a)
 The commission by rule, in consultation with the Department of
 Public Safety and regional leaders in driver education and law
 enforcement appointed under Subsection (b), shall require that
 information relating to law enforcement procedures for traffic
 stops be included in the curriculum of each driver education and
 driving safety course.  The curriculum must include a demonstration
 of the proper actions to be taken during a traffic stop and
 information regarding appropriate interactions with law
 enforcement.
 (b)  The advisory committee appointed under Section 1001.058
 shall assist in the development of the driver education and driving
 safety course curriculum requirements under Subsection (a).
 Sec. 1001.1091.  INFORMATION RELATING TO CHILD PASSENGER
 SAFETY SEAT SYSTEMS. The commission by rule shall require that
 information relating to the proper use of child passenger safety
 seat systems be included in the curriculum of each driver education
 and driving safety course.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Not later than March 1, 2018, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules
 required by Sections 1001.109(a) and 1001.1091, Education Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2018, each provider of a
 driver education course or driving safety course shall submit the
 curriculum adopted pursuant to Sections 1001.109(a) and 1001.1091,
 Education Code, as added by this Act, to the Texas Commission of
 Licensing and Regulation for approval.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *