By: Koop, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 1372 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017; May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to information included in the curriculum of each driver education course and driving safety course. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 1001, Education Code, is amended by adding Sections 1001.109 and 1001.1091 to read as follows: Sec. 1001.109. INFORMATION RELATING TO TRAFFIC STOPS. (a) The commission by rule, in consultation with the Department of Public Safety and regional leaders in driver education and law enforcement appointed under Subsection (b), shall require that information relating to law enforcement procedures for traffic stops be included in the curriculum of each driver education and driving safety course. The curriculum must include a demonstration of the proper actions to be taken during a traffic stop and information regarding appropriate interactions with law enforcement. (b) The advisory committee appointed under Section 1001.058 shall assist in the development of the driver education and driving safety course curriculum requirements under Subsection (a). Sec. 1001.1091. INFORMATION RELATING TO CHILD PASSENGER SAFETY SEAT SYSTEMS. The commission by rule shall require that information relating to the proper use of child passenger safety seat systems be included in the curriculum of each driver education and driving safety course. SECTION 2. (a) Not later than March 1, 2018, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt the rules required by Sections 1001.109(a) and 1001.1091, Education Code, as added by this Act. (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, each provider of a driver education course or driving safety course shall submit the curriculum adopted pursuant to Sections 1001.109(a) and 1001.1091, Education Code, as added by this Act, to the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation for approval. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *