Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1442 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Wu, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Burton) H.B. No. 1442
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the release of certain defendants pending a motion for
 new trial or an appeal from a misdemeanor conviction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 44.04, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (i) to read as follows:
 (i)  Notwithstanding any other law, pending the
 determination of a defendant's motion for new trial or the
 defendant's appeal from a misdemeanor conviction, the defendant is
 entitled to be released after completion of a sentence of
 confinement imposed for the conviction. The trial court may require
 the defendant to give a personal bond but may not, either instead of
 or in addition to the personal bond, require:
 (1)  any condition of the personal bond;
 (2)  another type of bail bond; or
 (3)  a surety or other security.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *