Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1468 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1468


 AN ACT
 relating to the sanitation and safety requirements for certain
 artificial bodies of water maintained for public recreational
 purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1.005.  DEFINITIONS [DEFINITION]. In this code:
 (1)  "Artificial swimming lagoon" means an artificial
 body of water used for recreational purposes with more than 20,000
 square feet of surface area, an artificial liner, and a method of
 disinfectant. The term does not include a body of water open to the
 public that continuously recirculates water from a spring or a
 pool.
 (2)  "Licensed practitioner" [, "licensed
 practitioner"] includes a sex offender treatment provider who is
 licensed under Chapter 110, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "Public swimming pool" means an artificial body of
 water, including a spa, maintained expressly for public
 recreational purposes, swimming and similar aquatic sports, or
 therapeutic
 purposes. The term does not include an artificial
 swimming lagoon or a body of water open to the public that
 continuously recirculates water from a spring.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 341.064, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 341.064.  SWIMMING POOLS, ARTIFICIAL SWIMMING LAGOONS,
 AND BATHHOUSES.
 SECTION 3.  Section 341.064, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsections (a), (b), (c), (e), (f), (g), (i),
 (j), (k), (l-1), (n), and (o) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  An owner, manager, operator, or other attendant in
 charge of a public swimming pool or an artificial swimming lagoon
 shall maintain the public swimming pool or artificial swimming
 lagoon in a sanitary condition.
 (b)  The bacterial content of the water in a public swimming
 pool or in an artificial swimming lagoon may not exceed the safe
 limits prescribed by department standards.  A minimum free
 residual chlorine of 2.0 parts for each one million units of water
 in a public spa and a minimum free residual chlorine of 1.0 part for
 each one million units of water in other public swimming pools or in
 artificial swimming lagoons, or any other method of disinfectant
 approved by the department, must be maintained in a public swimming
 pool in use or in an artificial swimming lagoon in use.
 (b-1)  The department shall approve or reject a request to
 use another method of disinfectant under Subsection (b) not later
 than the 90th day after the date the request was made.  If the
 department does not approve or reject the method in accordance with
 this subsection, the person who made the request may file an action
 to compel the department to approve or reject the method or to show
 good cause for an extension of time to make a determination.  Venue
 for an action brought under this subsection is Travis County.
 (c)  Water in a public swimming pool or in an artificial
 swimming lagoon [open to the public] may not show an acid reaction
 to a standard pH test.
 (e)  Facilities shall be provided in a public swimming pool
 or in an artificial swimming lagoon for adequate protection of
 bathers against sputum contamination.
 (f)  A person known to be or suspected of being infected with
 a transmissible condition of a communicable disease shall be
 excluded from a public swimming pool and from an artificial
 swimming lagoon.
 (g)  The construction and appliances of a public swimming
 pool and of an artificial swimming lagoon must be such as to reduce
 to a practical minimum the possibility of drowning or of injury to
 bathers. The construction after September 4, 1945, of a public
 swimming pool or the construction after September 1, 2017, of an
 artificial swimming lagoon must conform to good public health
 engineering practices.
 (i)  Dressing rooms of a public swimming pool or of an
 artificial swimming lagoon shall contain shower facilities.
 (j)  A comb or hairbrush used by two or more persons may not
 be permitted or distributed in a bathhouse of a public swimming pool
 or of an artificial swimming lagoon.
 (k)  The operator or manager of a public swimming pool or of
 an artificial swimming lagoon shall provide adequate and proper
 approved facilities for the disposal of human excreta by the
 bathers.
 (l-1)  Rules adopted under this chapter may not prohibit the
 consumption of food or beverages in a public swimming pool or
 artificial swimming lagoon that is privately owned and operated.
 (n)  A county or municipality may:
 (1)  require that the owner or operator of a public
 swimming pool or of an artificial swimming lagoon within the
 jurisdiction of the county or municipality obtain a permit for
 operation of the public swimming pool or artificial swimming
 lagoon;
 (2)  inspect a public swimming pool or an artificial
 swimming lagoon within the jurisdiction of the county or
 municipality for compliance with this section; and
 (3)  impose and collect a reasonable fee in connection
 with a permit or inspection required under this subsection provided
 the following are met:
 (A)  the auditor for the county shall review the
 program every two years to ensure that the fees imposed do not
 exceed the cost of the program; and
 (B)  the county refunds the permit holders any
 revenue determined by the auditor to exceed the cost of the program.
 (o)  A county or municipality may by order close, for the
 period specified in the order, a public swimming pool or an
 artificial swimming lagoon within the jurisdiction of the county or
 municipality if the operation of the public swimming pool or
 artificial swimming lagoon violates this section or a permitting or
 inspection requirement imposed by the county or municipality under
 Subsection (n).
 SECTION 4.  Section 341.0645(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An owner, manager, operator, or other attendant in
 charge of a public swimming pool, wading pool, baby pool, hot tub,
 in-ground spa, water park, spray fountain, or other artificial body
 of water typically used for recreational swimming, bathing, or play
 shall comply with relevant pool safety standards adopted under this
 section.
 SECTION 5.  Section 341.064(m), Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1468 was passed by the House on April
 27, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 141, Nays 3, 3 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1468 on May 21, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 7,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1468 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 27, Nays
 4.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor