Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1486 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1486
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1486 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to peer specialists, peer services, and the provision of
 those services under the medical assistance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0999 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0999.  PEER SPECIALISTS.  (a)  With input from
 mental health and substance use peer specialists and the work group
 described by Subsection (b), the commission shall develop and the
 executive commissioner shall adopt:
 (1)  rules that establish training requirements for
 peer specialists so that they are able to provide services to
 persons with mental illness or services to persons with substance
 use conditions;
 (2)  rules that establish certification and
 supervision requirements for peer specialists;
 (3)  rules that define the scope of services that peer
 specialists may provide;
 (4)  rules that distinguish peer services from other
 services that a person must hold a license to provide; and
 (5)  any other rules necessary to protect the health
 and safety of persons receiving peer services.
 (b)  The commission shall establish a stakeholder work group
 to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (a).
 The work group is composed of the following stakeholders appointed
 by the executive commissioner:
 (1)  one representative of each organization that
 certifies mental health and substance use peer specialists in this
 state;
 (2)  three representatives of organizations that
 employ mental health and substance use peer specialists;
 (3)  one mental health peer specialist who works in an
 urban area;
 (4)  one mental health peer specialist who works in a
 rural area;
 (5)  one substance use peer specialist who works in an
 urban area;
 (6)  one substance use peer specialist who works in a
 rural area;
 (7)  one person who trains mental health peer
 specialists;
 (8)  one person who trains substance use peer
 specialists;
 (9)  three representatives of mental health and
 addiction licensed health care professional groups who supervise
 mental health and substance use peer specialists;
 (10)  to the extent possible, not more than three
 persons with personal experience recovering from mental illness,
 substance use conditions, or co-occurring mental illness and
 substance use conditions; and
 (11)  any other persons considered appropriate by the
 executive commissioner.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall appoint one member of
 the work group to serve as presiding officer.
 (d)  The work group shall meet once every month.
 (e)  The work group is automatically abolished on the
 adoption of rules under Subsection (a).
 (f)  The executive commissioner may not adopt rules under
 Subsection (a) that preclude the provision of mental health
 rehabilitative services under 25 T.A.C. Chapter 416, Subchapter A,
 as that subchapter existed on January 1, 2017.
 (g)  If the executive commissioner has not adopted rules by
 September 1, 2018, the executive commissioner shall submit on that
 date a written report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the
 speaker of the house of representatives, the chair of the Senate
 Health and Human Services Committee, and the chair of the House
 Public Health Committee explaining why the rules have not yet been
 adopted. This subsection expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Section 32.024, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (kk) to read as follows:
 (kk)  The commission in its rules and standards governing the
 scope of services provided under the medical assistance program
 shall include peer services provided by certified peer specialists
 to the extent permitted by federal law.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
 Services Commission shall:
 (1)  adopt the rules required by Section 531.0999(a),
 Government Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  appoint the members of the stakeholder work group
 established by Section 531.0999(b), Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes
 effect September 1, 2017.
 (b)  This Act takes effect only if the 85th Legislature
 appropriates money specifically for the purpose of implementing
 this Act.  If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, this Act does not take effect.
 * * * * *