Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1508 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Giddings (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 1508
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 May 2, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 22, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1508 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice to applicants to and enrollees in certain
 educational programs regarding the consequences of a criminal
 conviction on eligibility for an occupational license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 53, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. NOTICE OF POTENTIAL INELIGIBILITY FOR LICENSE
 Sec. 53.151.  DEFINITIONS. Notwithstanding Section 53.001,
 in this subchapter, "licensing authority" and "occupational
 license" have the meanings assigned to those terms by Section
 58.001.
 Sec. 53.152.  NOTICE BY ENTITIES PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL
 PROGRAMS. (a) An entity that provides an educational program to
 prepare an individual for issuance of an initial occupational
 license shall notify each applicant to and enrollee in the
 educational program of:
 (1)  the potential ineligibility of an individual who
 has been convicted of an offense for issuance of an occupational
 license on completion of the educational program;
 (2)  the current guidelines issued under Section 53.025
 by any licensing authority that may issue an occupational license
 to an individual who completes the educational program;
 (3)  any other state or local restriction or guideline
 used by a licensing authority described by Subdivision (2) to
 determine the eligibility of an individual who has been convicted
 of an offense for an occupational license issued by the licensing
 authority; and
 (4)  the right to request a criminal history evaluation
 letter under Section 53.102.
 (b)  The entity shall provide the notice required under
 Subsection (a) to each applicant and enrollee regardless of whether
 the applicant or enrollee has been convicted of an offense.
 Sec. 53.153.  REFUND AND ORDERED PAYMENTS. A licensing
 authority that determines that an entity regulated by the licensing
 authority has failed to provide the notice required by Section
 53.152 to an individual entitled to receive the notice and that the
 individual's application for an occupational license for which the
 entity's educational program prepares the individual was denied
 because the individual has been convicted of an offense shall order
 the entity to:
 (1)  refund the amount of any tuition paid by the
 individual to the entity; and
 (2)  pay to the individual an amount equal to the total
 of the following, as applicable:
 (A)  the amount of any application fees paid by
 the individual to the licensing authority; and
 (B)  the amount of any examination fees paid by
 the individual to the licensing authority or an examination
 provider approved by the licensing authority.
 SECTION 2.  Section 53.152, Occupations Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only with respect to:
 (1)  an individual who is enrolled in an educational
 program subject to that section on or after the effective date of
 this Act; and
 (2)  an applicant for enrollment in an educational
 program subject to that section who applies for enrollment in the
 program on or after that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *