Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1521 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1521


 AN ACT
 relating to the exchange of certain information between the
 Department of Family and Protective Services or certain foster care
 services contractors and a state or local juvenile justice agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.0052, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Juvenile justice agency" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 58.101.
 (2)  "Juvenile service provider" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 58.0051.
 (3) [(2)]  "Multi-system youth" means a person who:
 (A)  is younger than 19 years of age; and
 (B)  has received services from two or more
 juvenile service providers.
 (4) [(3)]  "Personal health information" means
 personally identifiable information regarding a multi-system
 youth's physical or mental health or the provision of or payment for
 health care services, including case management services, to a
 multi-system youth.  The term does not include clinical
 psychological notes or substance abuse treatment information.
 (b-1)  At the request of a state or local juvenile justice
 agency, the Department of Family and Protective Services or a
 single source continuum contractor who contracts with the
 department to provide foster care services shall, not later than
 the 14th business day after the date of the request, share with the
 juvenile justice agency information in the possession of the
 department or contractor that is necessary to improve and maintain
 community safety or that assists the agency in the continuation of
 services for or providing services to a multi-system youth who:
 (1)  is or has been in the temporary or permanent
 managing conservatorship of the department;
 (2)  is or was the subject of a family-based safety
 services case with the department;
 (3)  has been reported as an alleged victim of abuse or
 neglect to the department;
 (4)  is the perpetrator in a case in which the
 department investigation concluded that there was a reason to
 believe that abuse or neglect occurred; or
 (5)  is a victim in a case in which the department
 investigation concluded that there was a reason to believe that
 abuse or neglect occurred.
 (b-2)  At the request of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services or a single source continuum contractor who
 contracts with the department to provide foster care services, a
 state or local juvenile justice agency shall share with the
 department or contractor information in the possession of the
 juvenile justice agency that is necessary to improve and maintain
 community safety or that assists the department or contractor in
 the continuation of services for or providing services to a
 multi-system youth who is or has been in the custody or control of
 the juvenile justice agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1521 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1521 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1521 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1521 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1521 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor