Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1522 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 27, 2017      TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1522 by White (Relating to a task force to coordinate and make recommendations on parent engagement and education programs provided by state agencies.), As Introduced    No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.  The bill would amend the Government code to establish the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs. The bill would abolish the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs September 1, 2019, and direct the task force to meet on a quarterly basis and provide a report to the Legislature and the Governor no later than December 1, 2018 regarding the task force's recommendations. The bill take effect immediately upon a two-thirds vote from all members of each house or, if such a vote is not received, on September 1, 2017.Based on the Legislative Budget Board's analysis of the entities that would compose the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs, duties and responsibilities associated with establishing the task force, meeting quarterly, and providing a report to the Legislature and the Governor could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources. Local Government Impact No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.    Source Agencies:320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Texas Education Agency   LBB Staff:  UP, AG, EP, TBo, AW, JLi    

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 27, 2017





  TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB1522 by White (Relating to a task force to coordinate and make recommendations on parent engagement and education programs provided by state agencies.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB1522 by White (Relating to a task force to coordinate and make recommendations on parent engagement and education programs provided by state agencies.), As Introduced

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs 

 Honorable Byron Cook, Chair, House Committee on State Affairs 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB1522 by White (Relating to a task force to coordinate and make recommendations on parent engagement and education programs provided by state agencies.), As Introduced

HB1522 by White (Relating to a task force to coordinate and make recommendations on parent engagement and education programs provided by state agencies.), As Introduced



No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.

No significant fiscal implication to the State is anticipated.



The bill would amend the Government code to establish the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs. The bill would abolish the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs September 1, 2019, and direct the task force to meet on a quarterly basis and provide a report to the Legislature and the Governor no later than December 1, 2018 regarding the task force's recommendations. The bill take effect immediately upon a two-thirds vote from all members of each house or, if such a vote is not received, on September 1, 2017.Based on the Legislative Budget Board's analysis of the entities that would compose the Task Force on Parent Engagement and Education Programs, duties and responsibilities associated with establishing the task force, meeting quarterly, and providing a report to the Legislature and the Governor could be accomplished by utilizing existing resources.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Texas Education Agency

320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of, 644 Juvenile Justice Department, 696 Department of Criminal Justice, 701 Texas Education Agency

LBB Staff: UP, AG, EP, TBo, AW, JLi

 UP, AG, EP, TBo, AW, JLi