Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1600 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

                    By: Thompson of Harris, et al. H.B. No. 1600
 (Senate Sponsor - Watson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1600 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain mental health screenings under the Texas Health
 Steps program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.0249 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.0249.  MENTAL HEALTH SCREENINGS IN TEXAS HEALTH
 STEPS PROGRAM. The executive commissioner, in the rules governing
 the Texas Health Steps program, shall allow a provider to:
 (1)  conduct a mental health screening using one or
 more validated, standardized mental health screening tools during
 each annual medical exam of a recipient who is at least 12 years of
 age but younger than 19 years of age; and
 (2)  be reimbursed for conducting one mental health
 screening using one or more validated, standardized mental health
 screening tools during each annual medical exam of a recipient
 described by Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *