Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1608 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1608
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1608 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating a pilot program to provide summer internships
 for foster youth.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 264.1251 to read as follows:
 Sec. 264.1251.  SUMMER INTERNSHIP PILOT PROGRAM.  (a)  The
 department shall establish a summer internship pilot program that
 provides foster youth with the opportunity to develop marketable
 job skills and obtain professional work experience through a summer
 internship with a participating business, nonprofit organization,
 or governmental entity.
 (b)  The department may collaborate with other state
 agencies, as appropriate, to establish the pilot program.  The
 pilot program may be implemented in more than one department
 region.
 (c)  The department may enter into an agreement with one or
 more entities described by Subsection (a) to allow the entity to
 award internships to youth who participate in the pilot program.
 Internships provided under the pilot program may be paid or unpaid.
 (d)  Not later than April 1 of each year, the department
 shall select foster youth or former foster youth who are 15 years of
 age or older to participate in the pilot program.  Each youth
 participating in the pilot program shall enter into an agreement
 with the organization awarding the internship and the department
 relating to the terms of the youth's internship.
 (e)  The department shall complete an evaluation of the pilot
 program not later than the second anniversary of the date the
 program begins.
 (f)  The department shall submit a report on the evaluation
 of the pilot program to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and
 the speaker of the house of representatives.  The report must
 include:
 (1)  the number of youth who participated in the pilot
 program;
 (2)  the location and type of internships provided
 under the pilot program; and
 (3)  details of the department's efforts to recruit
 eligible youth to participate in the pilot program.
 (g)  The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 (h)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2018, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall establish the pilot program
 required by Section 264.1251, Family Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *