By: Minjarez (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 1608 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1608 By: Uresti A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to creating a pilot program to provide summer internships for foster youth. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 264, Family Code, is amended by adding Section 264.1251 to read as follows: Sec. 264.1251. SUMMER INTERNSHIP PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The department shall establish a summer internship pilot program that provides foster youth with the opportunity to develop marketable job skills and obtain professional work experience through a summer internship with a participating business, nonprofit organization, or governmental entity. (b) The department may collaborate with other state agencies, as appropriate, to establish the pilot program. The pilot program may be implemented in more than one department region. (c) The department may enter into an agreement with one or more entities described by Subsection (a) to allow the entity to award internships to youth who participate in the pilot program. Internships provided under the pilot program may be paid or unpaid. (d) Not later than April 1 of each year, the department shall select foster youth or former foster youth who are 15 years of age or older to participate in the pilot program. Each youth participating in the pilot program shall enter into an agreement with the organization awarding the internship and the department relating to the terms of the youth's internship. (e) The department shall complete an evaluation of the pilot program not later than the second anniversary of the date the program begins. (f) The department shall submit a report on the evaluation of the pilot program to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives. The report must include: (1) the number of youth who participated in the pilot program; (2) the location and type of internships provided under the pilot program; and (3) details of the department's efforts to recruit eligible youth to participate in the pilot program. (g) The executive commissioner may adopt rules necessary to implement this section. (h) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2018, the Department of Family and Protective Services shall establish the pilot program required by Section 264.1251, Family Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *