Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1629 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Coleman (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1629
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1629 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development of a quality-based outcome measure for
 the child health plan program and Medicaid regarding certain
 persons with HIV.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 536.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to read as follows:
 (f)  The commission, in coordination with the Department of
 State Health Services, shall develop and implement a quality-based
 outcome measure for the child health plan program and Medicaid to
 annually measure the percentage of child health plan program
 enrollees or Medicaid recipients with HIV infection, regardless of
 age, whose most recent viral load test indicates a viral load of
 less than 200 copies per milliliter of blood.
 (g)  The commission shall include aggregate, nonidentifying
 data collected using the quality-based outcome measure described by
 Subsection (f) in the annual report required by Section 536.008 and
 may include the data in any other report required by this chapter.
 The commission shall determine the appropriateness of including the
 quality-based outcome measure described by Subsection (f) in the
 quality-based payments and payment systems developed under
 Sections 536.004 and 536.051.
 (h)  In this section, "HIV" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 81.101, Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Health and Human Services Commission and the
 Department of State Health Services shall develop and implement the
 quality-based outcome measure required by Section 536.003(f),
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *