Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1655 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2017

                    By: King of Parker (Senate Sponsor - Huffines) H.B. No. 1655
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 4, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 11, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of certain offenses committed by members
 of the Texas military forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 42.0183(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  As soon as possible after the date on which the
 defendant is convicted or granted deferred adjudication on the
 basis of an offense, the clerk of the court in which the conviction
 or deferred adjudication is entered shall provide written notice of
 the conviction or deferred adjudication to the staff judge advocate
 general [at Joint Force Headquarters] or the provost marshal of the
 military installation to which the defendant is assigned with the
 intent that the commanding officer will be notified, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Article
 42.0183(b), Code of Criminal Procedure, applies only to a judgment
 of conviction entered on or after the effective date of this Act or
 a grant of deferred adjudication made on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *