Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1691 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smithee, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1691
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1691 By:  Hall


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of certain rest areas on Interstate
 Highway 27 in Hale County as the Nelda M. Laney Safety Rest Areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Y, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.2003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.2003.  NELDA M. LANEY SAFETY REST AREAS.  (a)  The
 northbound and southbound rest areas located on Interstate Highway
 27 in Hale County are designated as the Nelda M. Laney Safety Rest
 Areas.
 (b)  The department shall design and construct markers at
 each rest area described by Subsection (a) indicating the
 designation of those rest areas as the Nelda M. Laney Safety Rest
 Areas and any other appropriate information.
 (c)  The department shall erect markers at appropriate
 locations at the rest areas.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsections (b) and (c), the department
 is not required to design, construct, or erect a marker under this
 section unless a grant or donation of private funds is made to the
 department to cover the cost of the design, construction, and
 erection of the marker.
 (e)  Money received under Subsection (d) shall be deposited
 to the credit of the state highway fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *