Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1691 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1691


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of certain rest areas on Interstate
 Highway 27 in Hale County as the Nelda Laney Safety Rest Areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Y, Chapter 201, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 201.2003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 201.2003.  NELDA LANEY SAFETY REST AREAS.  (a)  The
 northbound and southbound rest areas located on Interstate Highway
 27 in Hale County are designated as the Nelda Laney Safety Rest
 Areas.
 (b)  The department shall design and construct markers at
 each rest area described by Subsection (a) indicating the
 designation of those rest areas as the Nelda Laney Safety Rest Areas
 and any other appropriate information.
 (c)  The department shall erect markers at appropriate
 locations at the rest areas.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsections (b) and (c), the department
 is not required to design, construct, or erect a marker under this
 section unless a grant or donation of private funds is made to the
 department to cover the cost of the design, construction, and
 erection of the marker.
 (e)  Money received under Subsection (d) shall be deposited
 to the credit of the state highway fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1691 was passed by the House on April
 27, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, 3 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1691 on May 19, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting, and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 146
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 1691 on May 21, 2017, by
 the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1691 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 16, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0, and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 146 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 1691 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor