Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1771 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2017

                    By: Price, Martinez (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 1771
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 16, 2017, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 16, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain weapons in or on the beds or banks of
 the Canadian River in Potter County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 7, Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended by
 adding Chapter 287 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 287. POTTER COUNTY
 Sec. 287.001.  DISCHARGE OF FIREARM PROHIBITED. (a)  In this
 section, "firearm" has the meaning assigned by Section 62.014.
 (b)  This section applies only to the segment of the Canadian
 River extending from the intersection of United States Highways 287
 and 87 and the Canadian River to:
 (1)  a point 1.2 miles west of the intersection, marked
 by a structure serving as a railroad trestle; and
 (2)  a point 1.5 miles east of the intersection, where
 the Canadian River enters the Lake Meredith National Recreational
 Area.
 (c)  Except as provided by Subsection (d), a person may not
 discharge a firearm or shoot an arrow from any kind of bow if the
 person is located in or on the bed or bank of the portion of the
 Canadian River to which this chapter applies at the time the firearm
 is discharged or the arrow is shot from the bow.
 (d)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  an individual acting in the scope of the
 individual's duties as a peace officer or department employee; or
 (2)  the discharge of a shotgun loaded with ammunition
 that releases only shot when discharged.
 (e)  This section does not limit the ability of a license
 holder to carry a concealed handgun under the authority of
 Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *