Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1790 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2017

                    By: Pickett (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 1790
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to revoked disabled parking placards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 681.012(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  On seizure of a placard under Subsection (a) or (a-1), a
 placard is revoked.  A [On request of the] person from whom the
 placard was seized may apply for a new placard by submitting an
 application under Section 681.003[, the department shall conduct a
 hearing and determine whether the revocation should continue or the
 placard should be returned to the person and the revocation
 rescinded].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *