Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1815 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2017

                    By: Reynolds, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1815
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 23, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the power of counties to enact park use rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 320.0455(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section applies to:
 (1)  a county with a population of 2.8 million or more;
 and
 (2)  a county with a population of 580,000 or more
 adjacent to a county with a population of 2.8 million or more.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *