By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1823 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1823 By: Zaffirini A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to properly recorded diacritical marks in vital statistics records, driver's licenses, commercial driver's licenses, and personal identification certificates. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 191, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 191.009 to read as follows: Sec. 191.009. USE OF DIACRITICAL MARKS. (a) In this section, "diacritical mark" means a mark used in Latin script to change the sound of the letter to which it is added or used to distinguish the meaning of the word in which the letter appears. The term includes accents, tildes, graves, umlauts, and cedillas. (b) The state registrar shall ensure that a vital statistics record issued under this title properly records any diacritical mark used in a person's name. SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 521, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Section 521.127 to read as follows: Sec. 521.127. USE OF DIACRITICAL MARKS. (a) In this section, "diacritical mark" means a mark used in Latin script to change the sound of a letter to which it is added or used to distinguish the meaning of the word in which the letter appears. The term includes accents, tildes, graves, umlauts, and cedillas. (b) The department shall ensure that an original or renewal driver's license or personal identification certificate issued under this chapter properly records any diacritical mark used in a person's name. SECTION 3. Section 522.030, Transportation Code, is amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: (d) The department shall ensure that an original or renewal commercial driver's license or commercial learner's permit issued under this chapter properly records any diacritical mark used in a person's name. In this subsection, "diacritical mark" means a mark used in Latin script to change the sound of a letter to which it is added or used to distinguish the meaning of the word in which the letter appears. The term includes accents, tildes, graves, umlauts, and cedillas. SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only to a vital statistics record issued by the Department of State Health Services vital statistics unit or a driver's license, personal identification certificate, or commercial driver's license or learner's permit issued or renewed by the Texas Department of Public Safety on or after January 1, 2019. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. * * * * *