Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1823 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1823


 AN ACT
 relating to properly recorded diacritical marks in vital statistics
 records, driver's licenses, commercial driver's licenses, and
 personal identification certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 191, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 191.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 191.009.  USE OF DIACRITICAL MARKS. (a)  In this
 section, "diacritical mark" means a mark used in Latin script to
 change the sound of the letter to which it is added or used to
 distinguish the meaning of the word in which the letter appears.
 The term includes accents, tildes, graves, umlauts, and cedillas.
 (b)  The state registrar shall ensure that a vital statistics
 record issued under this title properly records any diacritical
 mark used in a person's name.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter F, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.127 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.127.  USE OF DIACRITICAL MARKS. (a)  In this
 section, "diacritical mark" means a mark used in Latin script to
 change the sound of a letter to which it is added or used to
 distinguish the meaning of the word in which the letter appears.
 The term includes accents, tildes, graves, umlauts, and cedillas.
 (b)  The department shall ensure that an original or renewal
 driver's license or personal identification certificate issued
 under this chapter properly records any diacritical mark used in a
 person's name.
 SECTION 3.  Section 522.030, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The department shall ensure that an original or renewal
 commercial driver's license or commercial learner's permit issued
 under this chapter properly records any diacritical mark used in a
 person's name. In this subsection, "diacritical mark" means a mark
 used in Latin script to change the sound of a letter to which it is
 added or used to distinguish the meaning of the word in which the
 letter appears. The term includes accents, tildes, graves,
 umlauts, and cedillas.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a vital statistics record issued by the Department of State
 Health Services vital statistics unit or a driver's license,
 personal identification certificate, or commercial driver's
 license or learner's permit issued or renewed by the Texas
 Department of Public Safety on or after January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1823 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1823 on May 26, 2017, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1823 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 130,
 Nays 14, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1823 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1823 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor