Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1913 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1913
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2017;
 May 3, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required qualifications for serving as president of
 the University of North Texas Health Science Center at Fort Worth
 and to the prohibition against the award of certain degrees by the
 center's governing board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 105.102(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  The board shall appoint a president of each component
 institution who serves as chief executive officer of the
 institution. [The president of the University of North Texas
 Health Science Center at Fort Worth must be a licensed physician who
 possesses a doctor of osteopathy degree from an accredited college
 of osteopathic medicine and must have been licensed to practice
 medicine in a state of the United States for at least five years.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 105.402, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *