Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1934 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Minjarez, Blanco, Cosper H.B. No. 1934
 (Senate Sponsor - Campbell)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2017, reported favorably, as amended, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By:  Campbell
 Amend H.B. 1934 (house engrossed version) by adding the
 following appropriately numbered SECTION to the bill and
 renumbering subsequent SECTIONS of the bill accordingly:
 SECTION ____.  The State Board for Educator Certification is
 required to implement this Act only if the legislature appropriates
 money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not
 appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the board may, but
 is not required to, implement this Act using other appropriations
 available for the purpose.
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to temporary certification of an educator from outside the
 state who is the spouse of an active duty military service member.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.052, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1) and (d-1) and amending Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (b-1)  The board shall propose rules to establish procedures
 to expedite the processing of an application for a certificate
 under this section submitted by an educator who is the spouse of a
 person who is serving on active duty as a member of the armed forces
 of the United States, including rules for providing the appropriate
 documentation to establish the educator's status as a spouse of a
 person who is serving on active duty as a member of the armed forces
 of the United States.
 (c)  The board may issue a temporary certificate under this
 section to an educator who holds a degree required by Subsection
 (a)(1) and a certificate or other credential required by Subsection
 (a)(2) but who has not satisfied the requirements prescribed by
 Subsection (a)(3).  Subject to Subsections [Subsection] (d) and
 (d-1), the board may specify the term of a temporary certificate
 issued under this subsection.
 (d-1)  A temporary certificate issued under Subsection (c)
 to an educator who is the spouse of a person who is serving on active
 duty as a member of the armed forces of the United States may not
 expire before the third anniversary of the date on which the board
 completes the review of the educator's credentials and informs the
 educator of the examination or examinations under Section 21.048 on
 which the educator must perform satisfactorily to receive a
 standard certificate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *