Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1975 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Villalba (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1975
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2017;
 May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 21, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to enforcement of a lien on property in a self-service
 storage facility by a sale conducted through an Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 59.044, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For the purposes of Subsection (a)(5), the place of a
 sale is:
 (1)  the physical address of the location of the sale if
 the sale is conducted at the self-service storage facility or a
 reasonably near public place; or
 (2)  the address of the Internet website if the sale is
 conducted through an Internet website.
 SECTION 2.  Section 59.045, Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 59.045.  CONDUCT OF SALE. (a) A sale under this
 subchapter must be a public sale:
 (1)  conducted at the self-service storage facility or
 a reasonably near public place; or
 (2)  conducted through an Internet website accessible
 to the public.
 (b)  The lessor must conduct the sale according to the terms
 specified in the notice advertising the sale and sell the property
 to the highest bidder.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *