Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2004 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Anderson of McLennan (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2004
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2004 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas economic development fund for the Department
 of Agriculture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 12.0272(a) and (b), Agriculture Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas economic development fund is a fund in the
 state treasury. The fund consists of:
 (1)  all interest, income, revenue, and other assets
 associated with economic development programs established using
 money allocated and paid to the department under the August 15,
 2011, allocation agreement between the department and the United
 States Department of the Treasury, as amended, to implement the
 State Small Business Credit Initiative Act of 2010 (12 U.S.C.
 Section 5701 et seq.);
 (2)  all money, deposits, distributions, dividends,
 earnings, gain, income, interest, proceeds, profits, program
 income, rents, returns of capital, returns on investments,
 royalties, revenue, or yields received or realized by the
 department as a result of an investment made by or on behalf of the
 department pursuant to the August 15, 2011, allocation agreement
 between the department and the United States Department of the
 Treasury, as amended;
 (3)  gifts, loans, donations, aid, appropriations,
 guaranties, allocations, subsidies, grants, or contributions
 received under Sections 12.022 and [Section] 12.027(g);
 (4)  interest and income earned on the investment of
 money in the fund; and
 (5)  other money required by law to be deposited in the
 fund.
 (b)  Money in the Texas economic development fund is
 dedicated to and may be appropriated only to the department for the
 purposes [purpose] of administering, continuing [establishing],
 implementing, or maintaining:
 (1)  an economic development program originally
 established as part of the department's implementation of the State
 Small Business Credit Initiative; and
 (2)  [under this section and is dedicated to and may be
 used only for the administration, establishment, implementation,
 or maintenance of] one or more of the department's economic
 development programs:
 (A)  established to encourage the export of Texas
 agricultural products or products manufactured in rural Texas; or
 (B)  established through an agreement with a
 federal agency, foreign governmental entity, local governmental
 entity, nonprofit organization, private entity, public university,
 or state governmental entity to encourage rural economic
 development in this state.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 adding Section 12.0273 to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.0273.  LIMITATIONS ON LOANS AND GRANTS FROM TEXAS
 ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT FUND.  (a)  The department may use money in the
 Texas economic development fund only to make loans and grants in the
 manner provided by this section for the purposes provided by
 Section 12.0272(b).
 (b)  The recipient of a grant using money from the fund must
 provide matching funds in an amount equal to 25 percent of the
 amount of the grant.
 (c)  The term of a loan made using money from the fund may not
 exceed 20 years. A loan must require monthly payments of principal
 and interest beginning not later than the 90th day after the date
 the loan is made.
 (d)  The department shall administer the fund as a perpetual
 source of financing for loans and grants under this section. The
 department shall use payments of principal and interest to make
 additional loans and grants.
 (e)  The cumulative amount of loans and grants to any person
 using money from the fund may not exceed $1 million.
 (f)  The department shall retain in the fund in the state
 treasury an amount of money equal to at least 25 percent of the
 amount of money in the fund on January 1, 2017.
 (g)  Not later than December 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the department shall submit a report on the status of the fund,
 including loans and grants made using money from the fund, to the
 governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of
 representatives, and chairs of the house and senate committees with
 primary jurisdiction over the department.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *