Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2008 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Cosper, Bernal, Craddick H.B. No. 2008
 (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 9, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deferred presentment transactions made to military
 borrowers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 342.604, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A lender who engages in a deferred presentment
 transaction with a member of the United States military or a
 dependent of a member of the United States military must comply with
 10 U.S.C. Section 987 and any regulations adopted under that law, to
 the extent applicable.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *