Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2027 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2017

                    By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Collin) H.B. No. 2027
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2017;
 May 1, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain laws regulating the sale or
 transfer of secondhand watches.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  An offense under Section 17.22, Business &
 Commerce Code, may not be prosecuted after the effective date of
 this Act. If on the effective date of this Act a criminal action is
 pending for an offense under Section 17.22, Business & Commerce
 Code, the action is dismissed on that date. However, a final
 conviction for an offense under Section 17.22, Business & Commerce
 Code, that exists on the effective date of this Act is unaffected by
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *