Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2036 House Committee Report / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 30, 2017      TO: Honorable Larry Phillips, Chair, House Committee on Insurance      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2036 by King, Phil (Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2036, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.However, there would be a negative impact of ($20,438,521) to General Revenue Related Funds through the biennium ending August 31, 2021. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 85TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 30, 2017





  TO: Honorable Larry Phillips, Chair, House Committee on Insurance      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB2036 by King, Phil (Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted  

TO: Honorable Larry Phillips, Chair, House Committee on Insurance
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB2036 by King, Phil (Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Larry Phillips, Chair, House Committee on Insurance 

 Honorable Larry Phillips, Chair, House Committee on Insurance 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB2036 by King, Phil (Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

HB2036 by King, Phil (Relating to premium tax credits related to certain fees paid under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2036, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.However, there would be a negative impact of ($20,438,521) to General Revenue Related Funds through the biennium ending August 31, 2021. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB2036, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2019.However, there would be a negative impact of ($20,438,521) to General Revenue Related Funds through the biennium ending August 31, 2021.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0   2021 ($20,438,521)   2022 ($21,259,205)    


2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $0
2021 ($20,438,521)
2022 ($21,259,205)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromFoundation School Fund193  Probable Savings fromGR Match For Medicaid758  Probable Savings fromTobacco Receipts Match For Chip8025    2018 $0 $0 $0 $0   2019 $0 $0 $0 $0   2020 $0 $0 $0 $0   2021 ($17,052,000) ($5,684,000) $2,246,554 $50,925   2022 ($17,734,000) ($5,911,000) $2,332,912 $52,883     Fiscal Year Probable Savings fromFederal Funds555    2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0   2021 $3,144,366   2022 $3,265,235   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue (Loss) fromFoundation School Fund193  Probable Savings fromGR Match For Medicaid758  Probable Savings fromTobacco Receipts Match For Chip8025    2018 $0 $0 $0 $0   2019 $0 $0 $0 $0   2020 $0 $0 $0 $0   2021 ($17,052,000) ($5,684,000) $2,246,554 $50,925   2022 ($17,734,000) ($5,911,000) $2,332,912 $52,883  


2018 $0 $0 $0 $0
2019 $0 $0 $0 $0
2020 $0 $0 $0 $0
2021 ($17,052,000) ($5,684,000) $2,246,554 $50,925
2022 ($17,734,000) ($5,911,000) $2,332,912 $52,883

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings fromFederal Funds555    2018 $0   2019 $0   2020 $0   2021 $3,144,366   2022 $3,265,235  


2018 $0
2019 $0
2020 $0
2021 $3,144,366
2022 $3,265,235

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 222 (life, health, and accident insurance premium tax) of the Insurance Code. The bill would allow insurers and health maintenance organizations to take premium tax credits in an amount equal to the premium taxes imposed on health insurer provider fees due under Section 9010 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) that are allocated to this state. The bill would apply to premium taxes accruing on or after January 1, 2020. The Comptroller and Commissioner of Insurance would develop rules to implement the provisions of the bill. The bill would take effect September 1, 2017.

Methodology

The PPACA requires U.S. health insurance providers to pay, in aggregate, $8 billion in fees in 2014; $11.3 billion in both 2015 and 2016; $13.9 billion in 2017; and $14.3 billion in 2018. After 2018, fee revenue will grow at the rate of premium growth in the preceding year (assumed to be 4 percent in this analysis). Based on data from the Kaiser Family Foundation, this analysis assumes that 8.4 percent of PPACA provider fees would be allocated to Texas; a rate of 1.75% is applied for premium taxes.  This analysis assumes that premium tax credits for fees paid in accordance with the PPACA in calendar 2020 would be recovered in state fiscal year 2021 and that, thereafter, any fees paid in any calendar year would be recovered in the succeeding state fiscal year.  The estimated revenue loss associated with this provision is $22.7 million in 2021 increasing in subsequent years by the assumed rate of growth in premiums. Current law states that 75 percent of the insurance premium tax revenue is deposited to the General Revenue Fund and 25 percent of the tax revenue is deposited to the Foundation School Fund, as reflected in the table above. The Health and Human Services Commission reimburses managed care organizations participating in Medicaid and the Children's Health Insurance Program (CHIP) for the cost of paying the Health Insurance Provider Fee and associated state and federal taxes. It is assumed managed care premiums would be reduced if the insurers received a premium tax credit, resulting in a savings to the state. It is assumed the credit would only be for premium tax paid based on the fee amount and not any premium tax paid related to federal taxes associated with the fee that are also reimbursed by the state. Estimated savings is based on the amount of reimbursement for the Health Insurance Provider Fee in fiscal year 2017, projected growth in the nationwide applicable amount, and estimates of federal matching rates for each program.  Savings are estimated to be $5.4 million in All Funds, including $2.3 million in General Revenue Funds, in fiscal year 2021 and $5.5 million in All Funds, including $2.4 million in General Revenue Funds, in fiscal year 2022. 

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 454 Department of Insurance, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 454 Department of Insurance, 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 710 Texas A&M University System Administrative and General Offices, 720 The University of Texas System Administration

LBB Staff: UP, AG, SD, KK, LR

 UP, AG, SD, KK, LR