Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2039 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Huberty, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2039
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to creating an early childhood certification to teach
 students in prekindergarten through grade three.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.0489 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.0489.  EARLY CHILDHOOD CERTIFICATION. (a) To
 ensure that there are teachers with special training in early
 childhood education focusing on prekindergarten through grade
 three, the board shall establish an early childhood certificate.
 (b)  A person is not required to hold a certificate
 established under this section to be employed by a school district
 to provide instruction in prekindergarten through grade three.
 (c)  To be eligible for a certificate established under this
 section, a person must:
 (1)  either:
 (A)  satisfactorily complete the course work for
 that certificate in an educator preparation program, including a
 knowledge-based and skills-based course of instruction on early
 childhood education that includes:
 (i)  teaching methods for:
 (a)  using small group instructional
 formats that focus on building social, emotional, and academic
 skills;
 (b)  navigating multiple content
 areas; and
 (c)  managing a classroom environment
 in which small groups of students are working on different tasks;
 and
 (ii)  strategies for teaching fundamental
 academic skills, including reading, writing, and numeracy; or
 (B)  hold an early childhood through grade six
 certificate issued under this subchapter and satisfactorily
 complete a course of instruction described by Paragraph (A);
 (2)  perform satisfactorily on an early childhood
 certificate examination prescribed by the board; and
 (3)  satisfy any other requirements prescribed by the
 board.
 (d)  The criteria for the course of instruction described by
 Subsection (c)(1)(A) shall be developed by the board in
 consultation with faculty members who provide instruction at
 institutions of higher education in education preparation programs
 for an early childhood through grade six certificate.
 SECTION 2.  The State Board for Educator Certification shall
 propose rules:
 (1)  establishing requirements and prescribing an
 examination for an early childhood certificate examination as
 required by Section 21.0489, Education Code, as added by this Act;
 and
 (2)  establishing standards to govern the approval and
 renewal of approval of educator preparation programs for early
 childhood certification.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *